Global Patent Index - EP 1069191 A1

EP 1069191 A1 2001-01-17 - Tapping apparatus and method

Title (en)

Tapping apparatus and method

Title (de)

Abstichvorrichtung sowie Abstichverfahren

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé de coulée

Publication

EP 1069191 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00113436 A

Priority

CH 124599 A

Abstract (en)

Tapping device has movable filling apparatus for filling an open tapping opening (113) in the furnace with a plugging material (107); and a movable plugging apparatus for introducing a lance (102) into the opening. The plugging apparatus has a head (101) in which a through-bore is formed. The lance can be cooled. An Independent claim is also included for a tapping process. Preferred Features: The lance is made of copper or copper alloy and has a cooling channel which can be connected to a cooling water supply.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Abstichvorrichtung für einen Schmelzofen (108) mit einer verfahrbaren Fülleinrichtung zum Füllen einer offenen Abstichöffnung (113) an dem Schmelzofen (108) mit einer Stopfmasse (107) und mit einer verfahrbaren Stopfeinrichtung zum Einführen einer Lanze (102) in die Abstichöffnung (113). Indem die Lanze (102) und vorzugsweise weitere Elemente der Füll- bzw. Stopfeinrichtung kühlbar sind, kann die Stärke der Wandung (111, 112) des Schmelzofens (108) reduziert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23J 1/08 (2006.01); B09B 3/00 (2006.01); C21B 7/12 (2006.01); C21C 5/46 (2006.01); F27D 3/14 (2006.01); F27D 3/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 7/12 (2013.01); F27D 3/1536 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069191 A1 20010117; EP 1069191 B1 20050928; DE 50011237 D1 20051103; JP 2001056185 A 20010227

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-09-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-11-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011237 P 20051103

2005-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2005-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI NL

2005-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050928

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031125

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR LI NL

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010210

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI NL

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI