Global Patent Index - EP 1069202 A1

EP 1069202 A1 2001-01-17 - A paramagnetic, corrosion resistant austenitic steel with high elasticity, strength and toughness and a process for its manufacture

Title (en)

A paramagnetic, corrosion resistant austenitic steel with high elasticity, strength and toughness and a process for its manufacture

Title (de)

Ein paramagnetischer, korrosionsbeständiger, austenitischer Stahl mit hoher Dehngrenze, Festigkeit und Zähigkeit, und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Acier austenitique, paramagnetique, résistant à la corrosion et possédant une élasticité, une résistance mécanique et une tènacité èlevées, ainsi que son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1069202 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00890207 A

Priority

AT 123299 A

Abstract (en)

Production of components made of an alloy containing (in wt.%) maximum 0.1 degrees C, 0.21-0.6 silicon, 17.0-24.0 chromium, more than 20 but less than 30 manganese, more than 0.6 but less than 1.4 nitrogen, up to 2.5 nickel, up to 1.9 molybdenum, maximum 0.3 copper, up to 0.002 boron, up to 0.8 group IV and V element, and a balance of iron comprises melting the alloy, casting under atmospheric pressure, deforming at more than 850 degrees C and rapidly cooling, followed by further deforming at less than 600 degrees C and allowing to cool.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines paramagnetischen, insbesondere in Medien mit hoher Chloridkonzentration korrosionsbeständigen Werkstoffes mit hoher Dehngrenze, Festigkeit und Zähigkeit. Eine Legierung bestehend aus in Gew.-% max. 0,1 Kohlenstoff, 0,21 bis 0,6 Silizium, 17,0 bis 24,0 Chrom sowie Mangen und Stickstoff, bis 2,5 Nickel, bis 1,9 Molybdän, max. 0,3 Kupfer, bis 0,002 Bor, bis 0,8 Elemente der Gruppe 4 und 5 des Periodensystems Rest Eisen, erschmelzungsbedingte Begleitelemente und Verunreinigungen, wird erfindungsgemäß mit mehr als 0,6 Gew.-%, jedoch weniger als 1,4 Gew.-% Stickstoff erschmolzen, unter Atmosphärendruck zu einem Block oder Gußstück erstarren gelassen und der gebildete Block bzw. das Gußstück in einem ersten Schritt einer Warmverformung bei einer Umformtemperatur von höher als 850 °C unterworfen und darauffolgend mit erhöhter Geschwindigkeit abgekühlt, wonach in einem zweiten Schritt eine weitere Umformung des Schmiedestückes bei einer Temperatur von unter 600°C erfolgt und danach der Umformteil auf Raumtemperatur erkalten gelassen wird. Die Verwendung des austenitischen Werkstoffes erfolgt vorzugsweise für Einrichtungen in der Ölfeldtechnik, insbesondere für Bohrstrangkomponenten und für Verbindungselemente mit hoher Festigkeit unter korrosiven Bedindungen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/38; C22C 38/04; C22C 38/58; C21D 8/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 6/00 (2006.01); C21D 8/12 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/44 (2006.01); C22C 38/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/001 (2013.01); C21D 6/002 (2013.01); C21D 8/1222 (2013.01); C21D 8/1227 (2013.01); C22C 38/44 (2013.01); C22C 38/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069202 A1 20010117; EP 1069202 B1 20021211; AT 229575 T 20021215; AT 407882 B 20010725; AT A123299 A 20001115; CA 2313975 A1 20010115; CA 2313975 C 20050628; DE 50000903 D1 20030123; ES 2187434 T3 20030616; US 6454879 B1 20020924

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20060425

2007-05-23 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20060425

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHOELLER-BLECKMANN OILFIELD TECHNOLOGY G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BOHLER EDELSTAHL G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: EDELSTAHL WITTEN KREFELD GMBH

2003-11-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: EDELSTAHL WITTEN KREFELD GMBH

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1069202E

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030629

2003-06-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030629

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187434 T3

2003-04-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-03-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-03-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-02-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030110

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000903 20030123

2003-01-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229575 T 20021215

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI