Global Patent Index - EP 1069211 A2

EP 1069211 A2 2001-01-17 - Electroplating solutions

Title (en)

Electroplating solutions

Title (de)

Elektroplattierungslösungen

Title (fr)

Solutions pour l'électroplacage

Publication

EP 1069211 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305941 A

Priority

  • US 14415999 P
  • US 58359900 A

Abstract (en)

An acid copper electroplating composition comprising an aqueous solution of an acid and a copper salt, wherein at least one carrier compound, a water-soluble, mercapto-containing organic brightener compound and a leveller compound which comprises an organic compound containing single or multiple charged centres are present.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 3/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/38 (2006.01); C25D 7/12 (2006.01); H01L 21/288 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069211 A2 20010117; EP 1069211 A3 20031217; JP 2001073182 A 20010321; KR 20010015342 A 20010226; US 2004187731 A1 20040930

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041218

2004-10-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI