Global Patent Index - EP 1069220 A1

EP 1069220 A1 2001-01-17 - Method and auxiliary device for leasing threads into guiding members of an apparatus for treating the threads and such a treatment apparatus

Title (en)

Method and auxiliary device for leasing threads into guiding members of an apparatus for treating the threads and such a treatment apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren und Hilfsvorrichtung zum Einlesen von Fäden in Führungsorgane einer Behandlungsvorrichtung zur Behandlung der Fäden und eine solche Behandlungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif auxiliaire pour passer des fils dans des organes de guidage d'un dispositif de traitement des fils ainsi qu'un tel dispositif de traitement

Publication

EP 1069220 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810641 A

Priority

EP 99810641 A

Abstract (en)

The yarns (F) comprising the warp are placed in a comb (11) and held by a clamp (15). They are drawn through the sizing machine by means of the residual yarns (R). At each guide reed (2) the comb is lined up with the reed by projections (14) on the comb and the yarns transferred into the reed. Independent claims are also included for the following: (a) a threading aid comprising a comb (11) made of plates (17) with gaps (13) and a yarn clamp (15); (b) a treatment machine, especially a sizing machine, with guide reeds and a threading aid in which yarns are held and from which they can be transferred to the reeds.

Abstract (de)

Zum Einlesen von Läden (F), insbesondere Kettfäden, in Führungsorgane (2) einer Behandlungsvorrichtung (1) wie Kämme oder Riete werden die Fäden (F) zuerst in einen Einlesekamm (11) geordnet eingelesen und daran befestigt. Die Fäden (F) werden anschliessend mit dem Einlesekamm (11) durch die Vorrichtung (1) geführt. Dabei werden die Fäden (F) von den Führungsorganen (2) übernommen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03J 1/14; D02H 13/16; D03J 3/00; D06B 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02H 9/00 (2006.01); D02H 13/16 (2006.01); D03J 1/02 (2006.01); D03J 1/14 (2006.01); D03J 3/00 (2006.01); D06B 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 23/06 (2013.01); D02H 13/16 (2013.01); D03J 1/14 (2013.01); D03J 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069220 A1 20010117; EP 1069220 B1 20040929; AU 5533100 A 20010205; BR 0006941 A 20010731; CZ 20010931 A3 20010815; DE 59910664 D1 20041104; JP 2003505608 A 20030212; US 7000296 B1 20060221; WO 0106049 A1 20010125

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090716

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080604

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-09-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050109

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910664 P 20041104

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030218

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI