Global Patent Index - EP 1069221 A2

EP 1069221 A2 2001-01-17 - Shaping

Title (en)

Shaping

Title (de)

Spickeln

Title (fr)

Façonner

Publication

EP 1069221 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119914 A

Priority

  • DE 19616003 A
  • EP 97922857 A

Abstract (en)

To form a three-dimensional knitted structure with a knitter, with casting off stitches, the stitches (18b, 20) are hung on needles over a section of the needle bed close to the centre, and then knitted further. Stitches (18b, 20) are drawn together by hanging on needles at a section away from the centre of the needle bed and further stitched, or separate stitches are taken from separate needle bed sections and then hung together and linked together by stitching or laying to the side to be caught. Also claimed is the textile material obtained. Preferably the successive increase/decrease stages are for at least one stitch in each row until a given number of stitches is increased or decreased to the required stitch count. The hanging of stitches lying further inwards or outwards is through transfer of the stitches from a needle section from the active needle bed to another needle bed, the other needle bed slides against the active bed, and the stitches are hung back on to the active needle bed.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines dreidimensionalen Gestricks auf einer Strickmaschine, bei dem Nadeln in einem Teilbereich (72,74,76,78) des Nadelbettes über zumindest eine Maschenreihe inaktiviert und anschließend wieder aktiviert werden. Hierbei werden zumindest in dem inaktivierten und angrenzenden aktiven Bereich Schuß- und/oder Kettfäden zur Verstärkung des Gestricks eingelegt, um eine homogenre Linie im Verbindungsbereich zwischen den aktiven und inaktiven Abschnitten zu erzielen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/00 (2006.01); D04B 1/22 (2006.01); D04B 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2013.01); D04B 1/108 (2013.01); D10B 2403/032 (2013.01); D10B 2403/0332 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19616003 A1 19971023; EP 0904439 A1 19990331; EP 1069221 A2 20010117; EP 1069221 A3 20010214; EP 1069221 B1 20050119; EP 1074647 A2 20010207; EP 1074647 A3 20010214; EP 1074647 B1 20040922; EP 1074648 A2 20010207; EP 1074648 A3 20010214; EP 1074648 B1 20040804; EP 1074649 A2 20010207; EP 1074649 A3 20010228; EP 1074649 B1 20031210; EP 1074650 A2 20010207; EP 1074650 A3 20010214; EP 1074650 B1 20050119; JP 2001501259 A 20010130; US 2001001925 A1 20010531; US 6116057 A 20000912; US 6233976 B1 20010522; US 6308536 B2 20011030; WO 9740220 A1 19971030

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170417

2017-05-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170417

2017-04-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59712174

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160423

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-01-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050425

2005-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712174 P 20050224

2005-01-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0904439 P

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-01-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031119

2002-01-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEBRUEDER ACHTER GMBH & CO. KG

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-08-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RECARO GMBH & CO.

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROELL FRIEDRICH

2001-01-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 904439

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT