Global Patent Index - EP 1069222 A1

EP 1069222 A1 2001-01-17 - Method of consolidating fibrous and/or filamentary nonwoven webs

Title (en)

Method of consolidating fibrous and/or filamentary nonwoven webs

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verfestigung von Faser-und/oder Filamentvliesen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour consolider des non-tissés fibreux et/ou filamentaires

Publication

EP 1069222 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00113759 A

Priority

DE 19933360 A

Abstract (en)

Non-wovens containing fibers or filaments are consolidated by gas jets, which at impact have a density between 2 and 50 kg/m<3> and are at a speed equal to the critical velocity at the corresponding static pressure and temperature. The jets are produced by parallel or convergent nozzles. The gas can be superheated steam at 40 degrees K above static saturation temperature to compensate for the temperature drop in the nozzle. Temperatures above 350 degrees K can be used to obtain thermal consolidation or shrinkage effects.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren, bei dem der Einsatz von gasförmigen Arbeitsmedien zur Verfestigung von Vliesen einem wesentlich höheren Verbindungseffekt und eine effektivere Herstellung von verfestigten Vliesstoffen gegenüber dem Stand der Technik ermöglicht. Bei dem erfindungsgemäßen Verfahren befinden sich die Strahlen in einem kritischen Ausströmzustand und weisen zur Erreichung maximaler Impulswirkung beim Auftreffen auf die Faser-/Filamentoberfläche eine Dichte von 2 - 5 kg/m<3> und eine Geschwindigkeit auf, die der dem Ruhedruck und der Ruhetemperatur des Gases entsprechenden kritischen Geschwindigkeit gleichkommt, und welche durch Düsen erzeugt werden, deren Querschnitt über die gesamte Düsenlänge konstant ist oder sich zum Düsenaustritt reduziert, wobei der kleinste Düsenquerschnitt sich am Düsenaustritt befindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/46; D04H 3/10; D04H 1/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/44 (2006.01); D04H 1/492 (2012.01); D04H 1/542 (2012.01); D04H 3/11 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 18/04 (2013.01); D04H 1/44 (2013.01); D04H 1/492 (2013.01); D04H 1/542 (2013.01); D04H 3/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 3458905 A 19690805 - DODSON WILLIAM C JR, et al
  • [DA] WO 9506769 A1 19950309 - UNIV MANCHESTER [GB], et al
  • [A] CH 676408 A 19910131
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 013 (C - 0901) 14 January 1992 (1992-01-14)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 197802, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class F04, AN 1978-03151A, XP002152670
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198421, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class F04, AN 1984-131000, XP002152671

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069222 A1 20010117; DE 19933360 A1 20010118

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020314

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI