Global Patent Index - EP 1069231 A2

EP 1069231 A2 2001-01-17 - Device for smoothing shirts

Title (en)

Device for smoothing shirts

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Glätten von Hemden

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le lissage de chemise

Publication

EP 1069231 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114543 A

Priority

DE 19932450 A

Abstract (en)

The cuff treatment devices feature two tensioning bodies, which are inserted into each other. The tension surfaces (8,14) of the bodies are air permeable and are shaped like a section of a U-shaped channel with easily opened sides.

Abstract (de)

Um mit einer Vorrichtung 1 zum Glätten von Hemden 3 die in der Regel wesentlich steiferen Manschetten 16 zufriedenstellend glätten zu können, werden erfindungsgemäß zusätzliche Vorrichtungen 2 zum Glätten der Manschetten 16 vorgeschlagen, die jeweils zwei ineinander steckbare Spannkörper 7, 12 aufweisen, deren Spannflächen 8, 14 luftdurchlässig sind und die Form eines Abschnitts einer U-förmigen Rinne mit leicht geöffneten Schenkeln besitzen. Die Manschetten 16 brauchen auf diese Weise nicht zugeknöpften werden und können im ebenen Zustand gepreßt und geglättet werden, wobei sie mit insbesondere erwärmter Luft in Berührung gebracht werden können, um sie trocknen zu können. Die zwei Spannkörper 7, 12 können dabei so miteinander verbunden sein, daß sie sich auseinanderziehen und anschließend auseinanderklappen lassen, um die Manschetten 16 einfacher zwischen den Spannkörpern 7, 12 anordnen zu können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 71/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 71/24 (2006.01); D06F 71/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 71/24 (2013.01); D06F 71/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069231 A2 20010117; EP 1069231 A3 20021009; EP 1069231 B1 20041006; DE 19932450 A1 20010118; ES 2229999 T3 20050501

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130707

2014-10-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141010

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130706

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130706

2013-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008066

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120803

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110731

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080707

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080706

2009-06-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20090330

2009-03-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070726

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070724

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-06-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2229999 T3

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008066 P 20041111

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030704

2003-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030409

- Countries: SI

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030409

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAMRATH, JOACHIM

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SPIELMANNLEITNER, MARKUS

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WETZL, GERHARD

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI