Global Patent Index - EP 1069236 A2

EP 1069236 A2 2001-01-17 - Regulating the pressure in a headbox

Title (en)

Regulating the pressure in a headbox

Title (de)

Regelung des Druckes in einer Stoffauflaufdüse

Title (fr)

Régulation de la pression dans une caisse de tête

Publication

EP 1069236 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110345 A

Priority

DE 19932745 A

Abstract (en)

To control the pressure at the pulp suspension (100) delivery jet (5) of a stock inlet (1), at a papermaking or cardboard prodn. machine, at least one sensor (10) measures the pressure in the hydraulic zone linked to the delivery jet (5). The sensor (10) is within a channel (8) where the pulp suspension (100) is forced through by a pump (9). The pressure level, registered by the sensor (10), is used by a control unit to set the rotary speed of the pump (9). The pulp delivery jet (5) has at least one measurement point formed by at least one sensor (10) within the jet (5) and/or in the feed channel (8) and/or in the recirculation take-off channel (6). At least one measurement point with at least one sensor (10) is at least at one distributor. At least one pulp distributor (2) and/or at least one feed channel (8) has at least one additional take-off with at least one throttle set by a sensor. The opening and closing actions of the throttle control the timed pressure development at the pulp delivery jet (5). A time filter allows disturbances with a time constant of 0.5 sec. and pref. 1 sec. to be used for fine control. At least one distributor (2) is a lateral pulp distributor (3) and a central distributor. The stock inlet delivers the pulp suspension in a single layer or in multiple layers. An Independent claim is included for a pulp suspension pressure control operation, at a stock inlet, where the pressure is measured at or in the pulp suspension delivery jet (5) to control the rotary speed of the pump (9) in the feed channel (8) which carries the pulp suspension (100). Preferred Features: The hydraulic pressure is measured at the pulp delivery jet (5) and/or the feed channel (8) and/or a recirculation channel (6) and/or a pulp distributor (2). The conditions in the additional take-off channel are set by a valve. The lateral distributor (3) delivers the pulp suspension and/or extracted water from the fourdriniers.

Abstract (de)

Regelvorrichtung zur Regelung, vorzugsweise zur Feinregelung, des Druckes in einem mit einer Stoffauflaufdüse (5) eines Stoffauflaufes (1) einer Papier- oder Kartonmaschine hydraulisch verbundenen Raum, mit mindestens einer Zuleitung (8) für eine Faserstoffsuspension (100), mindestens einer Verteilvorrichtung (2) für die Faserstoffsuspension (100) und mindestens einer Ableitung (6) für die überschüssige Faserstoffsuspension (100) aus der Verteilvorrichtung (Rezirkulationsleitung) (2), wobei mindestens ein Sensor (10) zur Messung des Druckes in dem mit der Stoffauflaufdüse (5) hydraulisch verbundenen Raum vorgesehen ist und sich in der mindestens einen Zuleitung (8) mindestens eine von dem mindestens einen Sensor (10) beaufschlagte und drehzahlgeregelte Pumpe (Stoffauflaufpumpe) (9) befindet, die durch Änderung ihrer Drehzahl den zeitlichen Verlauf des Druckes in der Stoffauflaufdüse (5) regelt, und ein mit der Regelvorrichtung durchführbares Regelverfahren. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/02; D21F 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01); D21F 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/024 (2013.01); D21F 1/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069236 A2 20010117; EP 1069236 A3 20030709; DE 19932745 A1 20010322

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080305

2007-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071025

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2004-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040109

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI