Global Patent Index - EP 1069238 A1

EP 1069238 A1 2001-01-17 - Apparatus for deacidifying of books or the same

Title (en)

Apparatus for deacidifying of books or the same

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Entsäuerung von Büchern oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la déacidification de livres ou similaires

Publication

EP 1069238 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113739 A

Priority

EP 99113739 A

Abstract (en)

At the appts. to neutralize acid in the pages of books, they are placed in a vacuum chamber and treated with a powder which develops a leach. The powder is delivered in air streams by jets (12,13) which have an out-of-round outlet shape. The jets (12,13) have different outlet shapes, a circular arc shape, and different widths at the center zones than in the edge zones. The jets (12,13) are set at variable angles in a range of 6-20 degrees . The treatment chamber has an outlet opening, with a connection for a suction channel with a suction axial fan (10). The suction channel has return channels to the jets (12,13) to give a closed circuit. The jets (12,13) have an indirect connection to the supply containers for the powder which can develop a leach. The powder is pref. an alkaline hydrite. The books are placed on a trolley, with a reciprocating movement, with a program-controlled and variable movement speed.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zur Entsäuerung von Büchern oder dergleichen, wobei die Buchseiten in einer nach außen abgeschlossenen Behandlungskammer im Vakuum mit einem zur Laugenbildung befähigten Pulver beaufschlagt werden, wobei das Pulver in kreisenden Luftströmen über Düsen zugeführt wird, ist vorgesehen, daß die Düsen (12, 13) einen nicht-runden Austrittsquerschnitt aufweisen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 25/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 25/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 25/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069238 A1 20010117

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TURKOVIC, BOZENA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TURKOVIC, BOZENA

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000310

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI