Global Patent Index - EP 1069239 A1

EP 1069239 A1 2001-01-17 - Apparatus for deacidifying books or the same

Title (en)

Apparatus for deacidifying books or the same

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Entsäuerung von Büchern oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour déacidifier des livres ou similaires

Publication

EP 1069239 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113740 A

Priority

EP 99113740 A

Abstract (en)

The appts. to remove acid from book pages has a vacuum chamber where the pages are treated with a powder which can develop a leach. The books are positioned with the spines downwards and the covers are opened out into an angle open at the top, and are held in place. The book covers (9) are held in place by laying plates (7) of a non-magnetic material. At least one permanent magnet (8) is at the outer side of the laying plates, and holding units (14) of a magnetic material are laid at the inner sides of the book covers (9). The holding units (14) are plates, with burrs (15) of a soft rubber-type material on the sides towards the book covers (9). The book cover holding units (14) can be positioned at variable gaps in relation to each other. The permanent magnets (8) are held by an adhesive at the outer sides of the laying plates (7).

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zur Entsäuerung von Büchern oder dergleichen, wobei die Buchseiten in einer nach außen abgeschlossenen Behandlungskammer im Vakuum mit einem zur Laugenbildung befähigten Pulver beaufschlagt werden, wobei die Bücher mit dem Buchdeckel nach unten derart aufgeschlagen positioniert sind, daß die Buchdeckel einen nach oben offenen Winkel ausbilden und in dieser Position an Halterungen anliegen, ist vorgesehen, daß die Halterungen durch Anlageplatten für die Buchdeckel (9) aus einem nichtmagnetischen Material gebildet sind, daß an der Außenseite der Halterungen wenigstens ein Permanentmagnet (8) befestigt ist und daß im Bereich des Permanentmagneten (8) auf die Innenseite der Buchdeckel (9) Halteteile (14) aus einem magnetisierbaren Material aufgebracht sind.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 25/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 25/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 25/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069239 A1 20010117

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TURKOVIC, BOZENA

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TURKOVIC, BOZENA

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000310

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI