Global Patent Index - EP 1069243 A2

EP 1069243 A2 2001-01-17 - Soundproofing panel for acoustic barriers

Title (en)

Soundproofing panel for acoustic barriers

Title (de)

Plattenelement für eine Lärmschutzwand

Title (fr)

Panneau acoustique pour barriere antibruit

Publication

EP 1069243 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00115350 A

Priority

  • IT BO990394 A
  • IT BO990467 A
  • IT BO990557 A

Abstract (en)

A soundproofing panel (1) for acoustic barriers, which is defined exclusively by a sheet (2) preferably, though not exclusively, made of metal, and having, on one of the two lateral surfaces, a number of longitudinal sound-breaking fins (3) parallel to and facing one another, and each for breaking the front (F) of the incident sound wave; the longitudinal sound-breaking fins (3) having a T-shaped section, and being equally spaced along the whole lateral surface (2a) of the sheet (2) to define a number of open gaps (4) for preventing propagation of the incident sound wave; each gap (4) possibly housing an insert (9) of soundproofing and/or sound-absorbing material; and the back of each gap (4) possibly having drawings (11) with the concavity selectively facing inwards or outwards of the gap (4) to vary the total volume of each gap (4) on the soundproofing panel (1) as required. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 8/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 8/0058 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069243 A2 20010117; EP 1069243 A3 20010606; AR 029380 A1 20030625; CA 2314165 A1 20010114; IL 137249 D0 20010724; MX PA00006895 A 20041028; TR 200002066 A2 20010221; TR 200002066 A3 20010221

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040203

2002-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI