Global Patent Index - EP 1069248 A2

EP 1069248 A2 2001-01-17 - Operating device

Title (en)

Operating device

Title (de)

Betätigungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de manoeuvre

Publication

EP 1069248 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112976 A

Priority

DE 19932286 A

Abstract (en)

The device has at least one actuating element, a locking device, a movable carrier (46) and a blocking element (44) for releasing the carrier movement, whose operation is dependent on the position of the locking device. The locking device has a mechanical locking bar that can be engaged in shape-locking manner with the actuating element or blocking element. An Independent claim is also included for a vehicle with a lifting or loading arrangement for operation by an actuating element.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Betätigungsvorrichtung (42) mit einem Riegel (52), einem verstellbaren Träger (46) und einer Sperre (44) vorgeschlagen. Die Sperre (44) wird beim Bewegen des Trägers (46) aus einer Betriebsstellung heraus aktiviert und verhindert, daß der Riegel (52) in eine Stellung gebracht werden kann, in der die Betätigungsglieder (40) aktiviert werden können. Derartige Betätigungsvorrichtungen werden z.B. für landwirtschaftliche Frontlader (12) benutzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/20 (2006.01); E02F 9/24 (2006.01); G05G 5/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 5/28 (2013.01); E02F 9/2004 (2013.01); E02F 9/24 (2013.01); Y10T 74/20116 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19932286 A1 20010111; CA 2313553 A1 20010110; CA 2313553 C 20040914; EP 1069248 A2 20010117; EP 1069248 A3 20010404; JP 2001065001 A 20010313; US 6435053 B1 20020820

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060130

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 02F 9/20 A, 7E 02F 9/24 B, 7G 05G 5/08 B, 7G 05G 5/28 B, 7G 05G 5/00 B, 7B 66F 9/20 B, 7B 66C 13/56 B

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI