Global Patent Index - EP 1069248 A3

EP 1069248 A3 2001-04-04 - Operating device

Title (en)

Operating device

Title (de)

Betätigungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de manoeuvre

Publication

EP 1069248 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00112976 A

Priority

DE 19932286 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2313553A1] An actuating arrangement (14) for a front end loader or the like is provided with a locking bar (52), an adjustable carrier (46) and an interlock (44). The interlock (44) is activated upon movement of the carrier (46) out of an operating position and prevents the locking bar (52) from being brought into a position in which the actuating members (40) can be activated. The interlock prevents unintended activation of the loader whe n the carrier (46) is in the non-operating position and prevents the carrier from being moved from the operating position unless the actuators (40) are blocked from movement.</SDO AB>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/20; E02F 9/24; G05G 5/08; G05G 5/28; G05G 5/00; B66F 9/20; B66C 13/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/20 (2006.01); E02F 9/24 (2006.01); G05G 5/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 5/28 (2013.01); E02F 9/2004 (2013.01); E02F 9/24 (2013.01); Y10T 74/20116 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19932286 A1 20010111; CA 2313553 A1 20010110; CA 2313553 C 20040914; EP 1069248 A2 20010117; EP 1069248 A3 20010404; JP 2001065001 A 20010313; US 6435053 B1 20020820

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060130

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 02F 9/20 A, 7E 02F 9/24 B, 7G 05G 5/08 B, 7G 05G 5/28 B, 7G 05G 5/00 B, 7B 66F 9/20 B, 7B 66C 13/56 B

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI