Global patent index - EP 1069249 A1

EP 1069249 A1 2001-01-17 - Method and device for dispensing carbonized drinking water through a tap

Title (en)

Method and device for dispensing carbonized drinking water through a tap

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Abgabe von carbonisiertem Trinkwasser über eine Wasserhahnarmatur

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour distribuer de l'eau carbonisée par un robinet

Publication

EP 1069249 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114651 A

Priority

  • DE 19932674 A
  • DE 19935150 A

Abstract (en)

Method for delivering carbonated drinking water from a tap (1') comprises subjecting mains water to a carbonating stage (5'). The carbonated water is then allowed to attain atmospheric pressure without control of its speed of flow. An Independent claim is included for a device for carrying out the above process in which a choke device (9') is positioned between the carbonating device and the tap flow control (3') to allow the carbonated water to attain atmospheric pressure.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Abgabe von carbonisiertem Trinkwasser über eine Wasserhahnarmatur (1'). Hierbei wird herkömmlichem Trinkwasser aus dem Leitungswassernetz Kohlendioxid z.B. aus einer Kohlendioxidflasche zugesetzt und der Wasserhahnarmatur (1') zugeführt. Um eine Ausgasung von Kohlendioxid beim Zapfen des Trinkwassers aus dem Wasserhahn (2') zu vermeiden, wird vorgeschlagen, daß das mit Kohlendioxid angereicherte Leitungswasser unabhängig von der Durchflußmengensteuerung in der Wasserhahnarmatur (1') mittels einer separaten Drosseleinrichtung (9) auf Umgebungsdruck entspannt wird. In Zeiten, in denen kein carbonisiertes Trinkwasser gewünscht wird, wird die Drosseleinrichtung (9) so eingestellt, daß der Zufluß des Leitungswassers zur Wasserhahnarmatur (1') uneingeschränkt und ohne Drosselfunktion möglich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/04; E03B 7/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2013.01); E03C 2201/45 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069249 A1 20010117; HU 0002602 A2 20010628; HU 0002602 D0 20000928; HU 222757 B1 20031028

INPADOC legal status

2006-01-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050711

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI