Global Patent Index - EP 1069257 A2

EP 1069257 A2 2001-01-17 - Sensor controlled sun protection device

Title (en)

Sensor controlled sun protection device

Title (de)

Sonnenschutzanlage mit Sensorsteuerung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection solaire commandé par un capteur

Publication

EP 1069257 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114832 A

Priority

DE 19932731 A

Abstract (en)

The control system for operating the blind is housed and wired-up in the blind support system which secures it to the wall. Provision can also be made for housing sensors which, for instance, control the required degree of extension of the blind or have a protective function (monitoring wind loading). Suitable terminations are provided for connection to the domestic power supply.

Abstract (de)

Eine Sonnenschutzanlage mit einem Sonnenschutzbehang besitzt wenigstens einen elektrischen Antrieb, der mit Hilfe einer Steuerung (10) die Einstellung des Sonnenschutzbehangs ggf. in Abhängigkeit von Eingangsgrößen vorzugsweise selbsttätig vornimmt. Bei bekannten Sonnenschutzanlagen ist eine aufwendige Verdrahtung der externen Steuerung und der Sensoren und eine aufwendige Konfiguration der Anlage notwendig. Um dies zu vermeiden ist vorgesehen, daß die Steuerung (10) und/oder wenigstens ein eine Eingangsgröße erfassender Sensor (42) betriebsfertig verdrahtet in die Sonnenschutzanlage integriert ist und ein Versorgungsanschluß (36) vorzugsweise zur Verbindung mit einem üblichen Haushaltsstromnetz vorgesehen ist. Eine derartige Sonnenschutzanlage muß nur noch in der gewünschten Einbaulage montiert und mit dem nächstliegenden Verteiler des Stromnetzes verbunden werden. Sie ist sodann unmittelbar einsatzbereit. Ein Vorteil eines beispielsweise integrierten Windlastsensors besteht in der exakten Erfassung der Windlast im Bereich der Sonnenschutzanlage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 10/06; E06B 9/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/06 (2006.01); E06B 9/32 (2006.01); E06B 9/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/68 (2013.01); E04F 10/0659 (2013.01); E06B 9/32 (2013.01); E06B 2009/6818 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069275 A2 20010117; EP 1069275 A3 20030122; AT 278081 T 20041015; DE 19932731 A1 20010322; EP 1069257 A2 20010117; EP 1069257 A3 20030502; EP 1069257 B1 20040929

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100711

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50007964

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090723

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090727

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007964

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2004-01-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI