Global Patent Index - EP 1069262 A2

EP 1069262 A2 2001-01-17 - A vehicle parking apparatus

Title (en)

A vehicle parking apparatus

Title (de)

Fahrzeugabstellvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de parcage d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 1069262 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00650079 A

Priority

IE 990585 A

Abstract (en)

A vertical lift double decked vehicle parking apparatus comprises a ground engaging support (2) with a vehicle elevator platform (3) movable on the support (2) between a lowered ground-engaging position and a raised position. The lowered position is such that a car (5) can be driven onto the elevator platform (3) from either end and parked on the elevator platform (3). Drive means is then operable to raise the elevator platform (3) on the support (2) to the raised position. With the vehicle elevator platform (3) in the raised position, a second car (5) can be parked beneath the vehicle elevator platform (3). The ground engaging support (2) simply comprises a pair of spaced-apart pillars (8, 9), a cross beam (16) carries the platform (3) between the pillars (8, 9). Each of the pillars (8, 9) is of channel section and carriages at each end of the cross beam (16) run vertically with the pillars (8, 9) for raising and lowering the platform (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 6/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 7/02 (2006.01); B66F 7/28 (2006.01); E04H 6/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 6/06 (2013.01); B66F 7/02 (2013.01); B66F 7/28 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069262 A2 20010117; EP 1069262 A3 20020206

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-11-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04H 6/06 A, 7B 66F 7/28 B

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI