Global Patent Index - EP 1069264 A1

EP 1069264 A1 2001-01-17 - Motorized safety lock

Title (en)

Motorized safety lock

Title (de)

Motorisiertes Sicherheitsschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure de sécurité motorisée

Publication

EP 1069264 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99113431 A

Priority

EP 99113431 A

Abstract (en)

Lock has housing (1) with bolt (3), and system for controlling bolt displacement (5). Bolt is placed in opening (13) with lateral clearances so as to slide with no friction between retracted and exit positions. Control system has one-way engine powered by battery, and electronic part including data entry and display. Engine is attached to bolt through circular cam (25) and driving lever (27).

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne une serrure de sécurité motorisée destinée à être placée sur la porte d'une enceinte de haute sécurité. Le dispositif de l'invention est de fournir une serrure dont le fonctionnement est fiable et d'un moindre encombrement. Ce but est atteint à l'aide d'une serrure de sécurité motorisée comprenant : un boîtier (1), un pêne (3) susceptible de se déplacer en translation entre une position "rétractée" et une position "sortie", ce pêne comprenant une face d'extrémité avant (37), une face d'extrémité arrière (39), deux faces latérales (41), une première (43) et une deuxième (45) faces longitudinales, des moyens de commande (5) du déplacement du pêne comprenant un moteur (21), des moyens d'activation de ce moteur et des moyens de connexion du moteur au pêne (25,27), pour transmettre la force d'entraînement du moteur (21) audit pêne (3) et assurer le déplacement de celui-ci, caractérisée en ce que le moteur (21) est un moteur à un seul sens de rotation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 15/04 (2006.01); E05B 17/20 (2006.01); E05B 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 17/2092 (2013.01); E05B 43/00 (2013.01); E05B 2015/0486 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0024 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0031 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0069 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7068 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7424 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

US 5473922 A 19951212 - BAIR DAVID R [US], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069264 A1 20010117; EP 1069264 B1 20060405; CA 2312513 A1 20010112; CA 2312513 C 20090127; DE 69930736 D1 20060518; DE 69930736 T2 20070104; ES 2262271 T3 20061116; US 6434987 B1 20020820

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070108

2006-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2262271 T3

2006-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2006-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69930736 P 20060518

2006-04-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2006-04-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABA AG

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030929

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI