Global Patent Index - EP 1069269 A1

EP 1069269 A1 2001-01-17 - Latch mechanism

Title (en)

Latch mechanism

Title (de)

Verriegelungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de verrouillage

Publication

EP 1069269 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00306055 A

Priority

GB 9916632 A

Abstract (en)

A latch mechanism(10) having a latch bolt(14) for releasably securing a striker(34) in a closed position, the latch bolt being movably mounted on a chassis(16) of the latch mechanism, and a pawl(12) movably mounted on the chassis and engageable with the latch bolt to releasably secure it in a closed position, the latch mechanism further including a limiting member mounted in the chassis, the limiting member being positioned adjacent the pawl and latch bolt so as to limit relative movement therebetween by co-operation with an engagement portion of the striker when the striker is secured in the closed position following the application of an abnormal load to the latch mechanism. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069269 A1 20010117; EP 1069269 B1 20050302; DE 60018332 D1 20050407; DE 60018332 T2 20050630; GB 9916632 D0 19990915

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070717

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070717

2006-09-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-09-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060908

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-08-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-12-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60018332

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030523

2002-09-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARVINMERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYSTEMS (UK) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010504

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI