Global Patent Index - EP 1069270 A1

EP 1069270 A1 2001-01-17 - Vehicle door handle comprising controlled disengagable lock operating means

Title (en)

Vehicle door handle comprising controlled disengagable lock operating means

Title (de)

Türgriff für Kraftfahrzeuge mit gesteuerten entkuppelbaren Schlossbetätigungsmittel

Title (fr)

Poignée d'ouvrant de véhicule automobile comportant des moyens debrayables commandes d'actionnement d'une serrure

Publication

EP 1069270 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401955 A

Priority

FR 9909227 A

Abstract (en)

The handle (10) comprises a support (12), placed on the inner side of door, and a control plate (14), placed on outer side of door. The plate does not act directly upon an idler arm (22), but acts upon it through a disengaging mechanism. This disengaging mechanism comprises a transversal plate (49) having two radial arms (51,52). Safe opening of door is confirmed by transmitting small shock to user from idler arm, when spring (56) goes back to its original state by releasing accumulated mechanical energy.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une poignée (10) de commande d'un ouvrant de véhicule automobile comportant une palette de commande (14) qui est destinée à être déplacée par l'utilisateur depuis une position de repos jusqu'à une position d'ouverture, et un organe de renvoi (22) qui se déplace normalement avec la palette (14) depuis une position de repos jusqu'à une position d'ouverture et qui est relié à une tringlerie (64) de commande d'une serrure, caractérisée en ce que l'organe de renvoi (22) est relié à la palette (14) par l'intermédiaire d'un mécanisme débrayable (49, 22, 68, 66) dont l'embrayage est commandé par la centrale d'antivol du véhicule et qui, dans son état débrayé, accumule au moins une partie de l'énergie mécanique d'ouverture appliquée à la palette par l'utilisateur en vue de la restituer ensuite à l'organe de renvoi lors de l'embrayage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/12; E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/01 (2013.01); E05B 81/78 (2013.01); Y10T 70/5394 (2015.04); Y10T 70/5978 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7949 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069270 A1 20010117; FR 2796412 A1 20010119; FR 2796412 B1 20010907; US 6360572 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080216

2007-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071005

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI