Global patent index - EP 1069271 A1

EP 1069271 A1 2001-01-17 - Central double drive unit for window winder system

Title (en)

Central double drive unit for window winder system

Title (de)

Zentraldoppelantrieb für Fensterheber

Title (fr)

Entraînement centrale double pour lève-vitre

Publication

EP 1069271 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99500113 A

Priority

EP 99500113 A

Abstract (en)

A central double drive unit for window winder systems in vehicles, that uses a forward kinematic chain (C1) and another second chain (C2) of the Bowden system. Both chains have the condition of unification of fast interchangeability for their drive. The central unit (A) is fixed to the rail support of the direct simplified forward chain and enabling rotation in relation to the said rail by a certain angle ( alpha , alpha '), either positively or negatively, in which the shafts of the unit (E,E') and of the drums (E1,E1')-(E2,E2') are parallel and contained in the same plane. The entry and exit point (13) of the cable on the drum (8) of the forward chain is situated on the bisecting line of the total angle ( alpha , alpha '), and at the diametrical most distant end from the wheel (6) in relation to the central shaft (E,E'). The central unit (A) has some lugs (10,27) in which bolts (12) are fitted and connected to some adjustment slots (11) cut in the support of the forward rail, so as to facilitate the turning of the unit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 11/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/48 (2006.01); E05F 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/488 (2013.01); E05F 15/689 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069271 A1 20010117; EP 1069271 B1 20031022; DE 69912261 D1 20031127; DE 69912261 T2 20040729

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070706

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070427

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070706

2007-07-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060525

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69912261

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000603

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI