Global Patent Index - EP 1069275 A2

EP 1069275 A2 2001-01-17 - Sun protection device with position adapting depending on the incidence of light

Title (en)

Sun protection device with position adapting depending on the incidence of light

Title (de)

Sonnenschutzanlage mit sich dem Lichteinfall anpassender Behangeinstellung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection solaire à position adaptable selon l'incidence de la lumière

Publication

EP 1069275 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114880 A

Priority

DE 19932731 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1069257A2] The control system for operating the blind is housed and wired-up in the blind support system which secures it to the wall. Provision can also be made for housing sensors which, for instance, control the required degree of extension of the blind or have a protective function (monitoring wind loading). Suitable terminations are provided for connection to the domestic power supply.

Abstract (de)

Eine Sonnenschutzanlage besitzt einen Sonnenschutzbehang (52) und einen Antrieb (17), der über eine Steuerung (14) eine selbständige Anpassung der Einstellung des Sonnenschutzbehangs in Abhängigkeit von mehreren Eingangsgrößen vornimmt. Bekannt ist bereits eine Nachführung des Lamellenwinkels eines Raffstores mit Hilfe von Sensoren auf einer Lamelle. In der Praxis konnten diese Systeme jedoch nicht überzeugen. Um eine zuverlässig arbeitende Sonnenschutzanlage mit sonnenstandsabhängiger Nachführung zu schaffen, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Steuerung (14) die Behangeinstellung anhand einer Grundprogrammierung als Funktion wenigstens der Eingangsgrößen Zeit, Sonnenintensität und Himmelsrichtung vornimmt, wobei diese Eingangsgrößen für die Einbaulage der Sonnenschutzanlage individuell erfassbar sind. Eine solche Sonnenschutzanlage kommt ohne störungsanfälligen Regelkreis aus und nimmt die Nachführung der Einstellung lediglich als Funktion der Eingangsgrößen vor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/06 (2006.01); E06B 9/32 (2006.01); E06B 9/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/68 (2013.01); E04F 10/0659 (2013.01); E06B 9/32 (2013.01); E06B 2009/6818 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069275 A2 20010117; EP 1069275 A3 20030122; AT 278081 T 20041015; DE 19932731 A1 20010322; EP 1069257 A2 20010117; EP 1069257 A3 20030502; EP 1069257 B1 20040929

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-11-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI