Global Patent Index - EP 1069278 A1

EP 1069278 A1 2001-01-17 - Drilling tooth for earth drilling

Title (en)

Drilling tooth for earth drilling

Title (de)

Bohrzahn zur Erdbearbeitung

Title (fr)

Dent de forage

Publication

EP 1069278 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00110438 A

Priority

DE 19932440 A

Abstract (en)

The boring tooth has a tooth part and a shaft for releasable fixing in a holder of a boring unit. The tooth cutter of the tooth part lies outside a central line of the shaft. The tooth cutting plane runs at a pitch angle ( alpha ) to the shaft center line. The holder a positioning unit to hold the bore tooth in two defined working positions, which are offset at 180 degrees about the shaft center line to each other.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Bohrzahn zur Erdbearbeitung mit einem Zahnteil und einem Schaft zum lösbaren Festlegen in einer Halterung einer Bohreinrichtung. Derartige Bohrzähne werden in Bohrwerkzeugen für Erdbohrungen verwendet. Der Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zugrunde, einen gattungsgemäßen Bohrzahn anzugeben, der bei unterschiedlichen Bodenbeschaffenheiten ein verbessertes Arbeitsergebnis liefert. Diese Aufgabe wird erfindungsgemäß dadurch gelöst, dass bei einem gattungsgemäßen Bohrzahn die Zahnschneide des Zahnteils außerhalb einer Schaftmittellinie liegt und eine Zahnschneidenebene unter einem Anstellwinkel zu der Schaftmittellinie verläuft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 10/42; E02F 9/28; E21B 10/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/28 (2006.01); E21B 10/42 (2006.01); E21B 10/43 (2006.01); E21B 10/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/43 (2013.01); E02F 9/2858 (2013.01); E02F 9/2866 (2013.01); E21B 10/54 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069278 A1 20010117; EP 1069278 B1 20041229; DE 19932440 A1 20010125; DE 19932440 C2 20030410

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009078

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-02-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031229

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAUER MASCHINEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001110

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI