Global Patent Index - EP 1069299 A1

EP 1069299 A1 2001-01-17 - Injection device for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Injection device for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Einspritzvorrichtung für Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1069299 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402016 A

Priority

FR 9909179 A

Abstract (en)

Diesel engine has two control banks (1,2) connected to four injectors (3-6) through inverters (7-10). Control bank parameters such as currents or voltages are measured in module (11) and monitoring unit (12) produces Boolean fault signals which act through OR gates (13,14) to operate inverters and eliminate faulty control bank. Signals also give fault indication (16,17) and limit driver choice.

Abstract (fr)

Ce dispositif d'injection comprend des injecteurs (3 à 6) et un calculateur (CC) pour gérer l'injection de carburant par ces injecteurs. Le calculateur (CC) comprend deux bancs de commande (1,2) pour le pilotage des injecteurs (3 à 6). Des inverseurs (7 à 10) sont connectés entre les bancs (1, 2) et les injecteurs (3 à 6) de telle façon que chaque injecteur puisse être connecté sélectivement à chacun des bancs. Des moyens de détection (11, 12) d'une défaillance d'un banc de commande (1, 2) sont capables d'engendrer des signaux de défaillance (défaut_banc_1, défaut_banc_2) pouvant servir de signaux de commande des inverseurs de telle façon que, dès la détection d'une défaillance, les injecteurs pilotés par le banc défaillant soient déconnectés de celui-ci, tout en étant connectés à un banc non défaillant. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/22; F02D 41/26; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/26 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/266 (2013.01); F02D 41/22 (2013.01); F02D 41/3827 (2013.01); F02D 2041/227 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069299 A1 20010117; EP 1069299 B1 20050323; DE 60018855 D1 20050428; DE 60018855 T2 20060511; ES 2235800 T3 20050716; FR 2796420 A1 20010119; FR 2796420 B1 20050819

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070712

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070713

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070713

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070712

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070712

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-07-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060728

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-07-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060720

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051227

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235800 T3

2005-06-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-04-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60018855 P 20050428

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2005-03-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030819

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI