Global Patent Index - EP 1069315 A2

EP 1069315 A2 2001-01-17 - Turbo machines

Title (en)

Turbo machines

Title (de)

Turbomaschinen

Title (fr)

Turbomachines

Publication

EP 1069315 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00114868 A

Priority

JP 20130299 A

Abstract (en)

A turbo machine comprising: an impeller having a plurality of blades therewith; a casing having a flow surface defined therein and being positioned with the impeller therein; and a plurality of grooves being formed in the flow surface of the casing, for connecting between an inlet side of said impeller and an area on the flow surface of the casing in which the blades of said impeller reside, on a periphery thereof, wherein an index of determining a form of the grooves is obtained by a following equation: <DF>JE No. = WR x VR x WDR x DLDR </DF> where, WR (a width ratio) is a value obtained by dividing a total value of the groove widths W with a length of casing periphery; VR (a volume ratio) is a value obtained by dividing a total volume of said grooves with a volume of said impeller; WDR (a width-depth ratio) is a value obtained by dividing the width W of said groove with a depth D of said groove; and DLDR is a ratio between a length of said groove in flow, being lower than the impeller inlet and the depth of said groove, and wherein, said grooves are formed so that the index JE No. lies in a range from 0.03 to 0.5. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/42; F04D 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 27/02 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01); F04D 29/66 (2006.01); F04D 29/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/688 (2013.01); F04D 27/009 (2013.01); F04D 29/4213 (2013.01); F04D 29/4273 (2013.01); F04D 29/669 (2013.01); F04D 29/685 (2013.01); F05B 2260/96 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4212585 A 19800715 - CARTER ANTHONY F [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069315 A2 20010117; EP 1069315 A3 20020529; EP 1069315 B1 20070912; AT 373175 T 20070915; CN 1221741 C 20051005; CN 1281953 A 20010131; DE 60036336 D1 20071025; DE 60036336 T2 20080612

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160705

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160706

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: KUROKAWA, JUNICHI, JP

- Document: AT 373175 T

- Effective date: 20140924

2014-11-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: HITACHI, LTD., JP

- Document: AT 373175 T

- Effective date: 20140924

2014-07-11 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: HITACHI, LTD., JP

- Effective date: 20140612

2014-07-11 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: JUNICHI KUROKAWA, JP

- Effective date: 20140612

2014-04-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140313 AND 20140319

2014-03-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KUROKAWA, JUNICHI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI PLANT TECHNOLOGIES, LTD,JUNICHI KUROKAWA, , JP

- Document: DE 60036336

- Effective date: 20140218

2014-03-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HITACHI, LTD., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI PLANT TECHNOLOGIES, LTD,JUNICHI KUROKAWA, , JP

- Document: DE 60036336

- Effective date: 20140218

2014-03-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KUROKAWA, JUNICHI, YOKOHAMA, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HITACHI PLANT TECHNOLOGIES, LTD,JUNICHI KUROKAWA, , JP

- Document: DE 60036336

- Effective date: 20140218

2014-03-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HITACHI, LTD., JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: HITACHI PLANT TECHNOLOGIES, LTD., TOKIO, JP; KUROKAWA, JUNICHI, YOKOHAMA, KANAGAWA, JP

- Document: DE 60036336

- Effective date: 20140218

2014-03-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KUROKAWA, JUNICHI, YOKOHAMA, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: HITACHI PLANT TECHNOLOGIES, LTD., TOKIO, JP; KUROKAWA, JUNICHI, YOKOHAMA, KANAGAWA, JP

- Document: DE 60036336

- Effective date: 20140218

2014-03-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036336

- Representative's name: V. FUENER EBBINGHAUS FINCK HANO, DE

- Effective date: 20140218

2014-03-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140220 AND 20140226

2014-02-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036336

- Representative's name: V. FUENER EBBINGHAUS FINCK HANO, DE

2008-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080613

2008-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-12-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HITACHI PLANT TECHNOLOGIES, LTD.

2007-12-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KUROKAWA, JUNICHI

2007-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2007-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60036336 P 20071025

2007-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-09-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HITACHI PLANT TECHNOLOGIES, LTD.

2007-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KUROKAWA, JUNICHI

2003-02-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04D 29/42 A, 7F 04D 27/02 B, 7F 04D 29/66 B, 7F 04D 29/68 B

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000711

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI