Global Patent Index - EP 1069317 A2

EP 1069317 A2 2001-01-17 - Directional control valve section, especially for mobile equipment

Title (en)

Directional control valve section, especially for mobile equipment

Title (de)

Wegeventilscheibe, insbesondere für ein mobiles Arbeitsgerät

Title (fr)

Tranche de distributeur hydraulique, surtout pour un véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1069317 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112754 A

Priority

  • DE 19932325 A
  • DE 19937226 A
  • DE 19948232 A

Abstract (en)

Path valve disk has a cast housing with a design that accommodates the disk itself which is also a mass produced cast part. The valve housing accommodates the valve disk, which operates on the load sensing principle. The design has a new sand core for use in the casting process to accommodate the valve disk. In a second valve bore of a regulating piston a pressure scale is incorporated.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Wegeventilscheibe (20) für ein mobiles Arbeitsgrät, die eine Not-Aus-Funktion und/oder eine Auswahlfunktion für die Betätigung unterschiedlicher hydraulischer Verbraucher haben soll. Ziel ist es, diese Wegeventilscheibe (20) mit einem geringen Aufwand herzustellen. Erreicht wird dieses Ziel dadurch, daß für die Wegeventilscheibe (20) ein in großen Stückzahlen gegossenes Ventilgehäuse (40) verwendet und modifiziert wird. Die Ventilgehäuse (40) sind mit einem solchen Kern gegossen, daß sie für sogenannte Load-Sensing-Wegeventilscheiben verwendet werden können. Dabei wird in die zweite Ventilbohrung (82) ein Regelkolben einer Druckwaage eingesetzt. Gemäß der Erfindung ist nun in die zweite Ventilbohrung ein Trennkolben (90) eingesetzt, der eine feste Lage einnimmt und zwei Ringkammern (86,87) der zweiten Ventilbohrung (82) voneinander trennt. Über eine zusätzlich eingebrachte Bohrung (98) ist die Zulaufkammer (48) der ersten Ventilbohrung (41) mit der Pumpe (10) verbindbar. Die bisher schon vorhandene und eine zweite Ringkammer der zweiten Ventilbohrung anschneidende Bohrung kann über einen zusätzlichen Kanal zwischen den zwei Ventilbohrungen mit der Zulaufkammer der ersten Ventilbohrung verbunden werden. Über letztere Bohrung fließt Druckmittel den angebauten LS-Wegeventilscheiben (21) zu. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/04; F15B 20/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/22 (2006.01); F15B 13/04 (2006.01); F15B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/2267 (2013.01); E02F 9/2203 (2013.01); E02F 9/226 (2013.01); E02F 9/2271 (2013.01); E02F 9/2296 (2013.01); F15B 13/0402 (2013.01); F15B 13/0416 (2013.01); F15B 2013/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069317 A2 20010117; EP 1069317 A3 20011107; EP 1069317 B1 20030813; AT 247234 T 20030815; DK 1069317 T3 20031208

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140616

2015-01-19 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130621

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120616

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120616

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120616

2013-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 247234 T

- Effective date: 20120616

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BOSCH REXROTH A.G.

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-16 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-02-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-01-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040113

2004-01-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031211

2003-12-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-11-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031124

2003-11-13 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-11-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003247 P 20030918

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUETTNER, PETER

2003-08-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MAXEINER, THASSILO

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSCH REXROTH AG

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020411

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI