Global Patent Index - EP 1069373 A1

EP 1069373 A1 2001-01-17 - Motor vehicle headlight comprising a displaceable double light shield

Title (en)

Motor vehicle headlight comprising a displaceable double light shield

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeug-Scheinwerfer mit einer verstellbaren, doppelten Lichtblende

Title (fr)

Projecteur pour véhicule automobile avec un double cache mobile

Publication

EP 1069373 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401849 A

Priority

FR 9909081 A

Abstract (en)

The headlight has a lamp (11), reflector (20), lens and first and second shutters (50,70). The first shutter (50) may be turned about an horizontal axis (X,53,54) by an electromagnet (60) and linkage (54,55) to take up vertical and horizontal positions. The second shutter (70) is a bar pivoted (72) about an external point and able to take upper and lower positions.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un projecteur pour véhicule automobile, comprenant une source lumineuse (11), un réflecteur (20), une lentille, un premier cache (50), qui présente un bord (51) définissant un premier profil de coupure pour le faisceau lumineux émis, et un second cache (70) mobile entre une première position dans laquelle un bord du second cache est positionné de manière à former avec le premier cache un faisceau lumineux avec un deuxième profil de coupure, et une deuxième position dans laquelle ledit bord du second cache est hors du trajet des rayons lumineux. Selon l'invention, le premier cache est mobile entre une première position dans laquelle ledit bord du premier cache est positionné sur le trajet des rayons lumineux et une seconde position dans laquelle ledit bord du premier cache est sensiblement positionné hors du trajet des rayons lumineux, et le second cache est positionné à distance du premier cache. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 14/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 14/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1778 (2013.01); F21S 48/171 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0381851 A1 19900816 - HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069373 A1 20010117; EP 1069373 B1 20070321; DE 60033993 D1 20070503; DE 60033993 T2 20071206; ES 2283281 T3 20071101; FR 2796447 A1 20010119; FR 2796447 B1 20010817

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60033993

- Effective date: 20140101

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090630

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070321

2008-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071227

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070321

2007-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2283281 T3

2007-10-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070321

2007-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60033993 P 20070503

2007-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2007-03-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 14/08 20060101AFI20060825BHEP

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI