Global Patent Index - EP 1069374 A1

EP 1069374 A1 2001-01-17 - Motor-vehicle adaptive head-lamp having a central adjustable diaphragm

Title (en)

Motor-vehicle adaptive head-lamp having a central adjustable diaphragm

Title (de)

Adaptiver Kraftfahrzeug-Scheinwerfer mit einer verstellbaren, zentralen Blende

Title (fr)

Projecteur adaptif pour véhicule automobile avec un cache central ajustable

Publication

EP 1069374 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830455 A

Priority

EP 99830455 A

Abstract (en)

A motor-vehicle adaptive head-lamp has a diaphragm (6) located at the front of a central area of a reflector (2) with which a light source (3) is associated constituted by a discharge lamp. The annular area of the reflector (2) surrounding the central area is adapted to generate a light beam having a predetermined basic pattern. The opening of the diaphragm (6) uncovers an optical element (10) constituted by lens sectors adapted to generate additional patterns so as to give rise to a plurality of different beams, adapted to the different travel and environment conditions, which can be selected by varying the opening degree of the diaphragm (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 14/08; F21W 101/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 5/00 (2006.01); F21V 14/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1784 (2013.01); F21S 48/1233 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069374 A1 20010117; EP 1069374 B1 20050831; DE 69927006 D1 20051006; DE 69927006 T2 20060622

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060716

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-07-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060716

2006-07-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-10-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69927006 P 20051006

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2005-08-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040727

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000529

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI