Global patent index - EP 1069383 A2

EP 1069383 A2 2001-01-17 - Hot water accumulator

Title (en)

Hot water accumulator

Title (de)

Warmwasserspeicher

Title (fr)

Accumulateur d'eau chaude

Publication

EP 1069383 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114365 A

Priority

DE 19932748 A

Abstract (en)

The hot water storage reservoir has a storage housing (15) and a brown water container (10), with heating of the brown water by heat generated by combustion of a fuel mixture, a thermoelectric energy converter incorporated in the storage housing for providing electrical energy. The fuel (21) is fed to an energy converter (20) to provide heat for direct heating of the brown water, via a heat exchanger (16), the obtained electrical energy (22) used for powering an electrical load, e.g. a circulation pump, or fed to the electrical network.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Warmwasserspeicher mit einem Speichergehäuse und einem Brauchwasserbehälter, bei dem das Brauchwasser im Brauchwasserbehälter von der beim Umsetzen eines Brennstoffes erzeugten Wärme aufgeheizt wird und der einen Energie-Wandler zur Erzeugung elektrischer Energie im Speichergehäuse aufweist. Bei einfachem Aufbau wird ein verbesserter Wirkungsgrad dadurch erreicht, dass der Brennstoff einem Energie-Wandler zugeführt und in diesem umgesetzt wird, dass die bei der Energieumwandlung im Energie-Wandler freiwerdende Wärme direkt dem Brauchwasser im Brauchwasserbehälter zugeführt wird und dass die erzeugte elektrische Energie zum Eigenverbrauch verwendet und/oder externen, elektrischen Verbrauchern und/oder dem öffentlichen Stromnetz zugeführt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/20; F24H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/00 (2006.01); F24H 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/00 (2013.01); F24H 1/205 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069383 A2 20010117; EP 1069383 A3 20021113; DE 19932748 A1 20010125

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI