Global Patent Index - EP 1069388 A2

EP 1069388 A2 2001-01-17 - Tempering device for liquid contained in receptacles

Title (en)

Tempering device for liquid contained in receptacles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Temperieren von in Gefässen befindlichen Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour tempérer des liquides se trouvant dans des récipients

Publication

EP 1069388 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115215 A

Priority

  • DE 19932556 A
  • US 61809300 A

Abstract (en)

A casing (2) has a device for inserting and cooling a container (1). The insert has a cut-through retaining plate (4) with an opening (5) for the container that rests on a casing fitting strip (27) that has three wire straps (7) set apart stretching to the base and encased by a loosely fitting foil stocking (8). The casing is filled with a cooling substance (13) and fits in a recess (9) in the casing wall as a Peltier element (24) that has a heat-transferring surface (11).

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Temperieren von in Gefäßen (1) befindlichen Flüssigkeiten wie insbesondere von Getränken, bestehend aus einem Gehäuse (2) mit einem Einsatz für die Gefäße (1) sowie einer Kühlung, wobei der Einsatz eine durchbrochene Halteplatte (4) mit einer Öffnung (5) für die Gefäße (1) aufweist, die auf einem Gehäusevorsprung (27) der Vorrichtung aufliegt. An der Halteplatte (4) sind mindestens drei voneinander beabstandete Drahtbügel (7) angeordnet, die sich zum Boden der Vorrichtung erstrecken, wobei die Drahtbügel (7) fußseitig über Stege (7') zusammengefaßt sind und die Drahtbügel (7) umfaßt sind von einem lose an diesen anliegenden Folienstrumpf (8). Das Gehäuse (2) ist mit einem Kühlmedium (13) befüllbar, in einer Ausnehmung (9) der Wandung des Gehäuses ist als Kühlung ein Peltierelement (24) angeordnet, das eine Wärmeübertragungsfläche (11) und eine Gegenfläche (12) aufweist, wobei die Wärmeübertragungsfläche (11) von dem Medium (13) umspült und die Gegenfläche (12) belüftet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 31/00; F25B 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 21/02 (2006.01); F25D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/02 (2013.01); B67D 1/0869 (2013.01); F25B 21/02 (2013.01); F25D 31/007 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069388 A2 20010117; EP 1069388 A3 20010816; DE 19932556 A1 20010301; DE 19932556 C2 20010607; US 6370883 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031028

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030415

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010825

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI