Global Patent Index - EP 1069408 A1

EP 1069408 A1 2001-01-17 - Measuring device having a beam and a slider movable along said beam

Title (en)

Measuring device having a beam and a slider movable along said beam

Title (de)

Messeinrichtung mit einem Balken und einem entlang diesem Balken bewegbaren Schieber

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mesure avec un bras et un élément coulissant le long dubras

Publication

EP 1069408 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810178 A

Priority

CH 129599 A

Abstract (en)

Gauge comprises a bar (1) and a slider (10). On the top of the beam is a conducting path of resistive material. The top surface of the bar has a scale with two or more conducting paths parallel to the longitudinal axis of the bar. The first path comprises conducting and none-conducting sections and the second path includes the resistive path. An arrangement of bridge circuits is used to determine the position of the slider along the beam.

Abstract (de)

Die Messeinrichtung umfasst einen Balken (1) und einen entlang diesem Balken bewegbaren Schieber (10). Eine der Oberflächen des Balkens (1) ist mit einer Skala (7) mit zwei Bahnen (31,32) versehen. Die erste Bahn (31) ist als eine strukturierte bzw. codierte Bahn bestehend aus elektrisch leitenden und elektrisch nicht leitenden Materialabschnitten ausgeführt. Die zweite Bahn (32) umfasst unter anderem eine zusammenhängende Spur (36) aus einem Widerstandsmaterial. Der Schieber (10) weist eine Vorrichtung zur Abtastung der Skala (7) sowie eine Vorrichtung zur Verarbeitung der abgetasteten Informationen zu Messwerten auf. Die Vorrichtung zum Abtasten der Bahnen (31,32) umfasst Kontaktglieder (60;601,602,603), welche am Schieber (10) einerends befestigt und an die Verarbeitungsvorrichtung angeschlossen sind. Die freien Endpartien (63) der Kontaktglieder liegen auf den Spuren der Skalenbahnen auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01D 5/25; G01B 7/00; G01B 7/02; G01D 5/165; G01D 5/249

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 3/20 (2006.01); G01D 5/165 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01D 5/1655 (2013.01); G01B 3/205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069408 A1 20010117

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070306

2006-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061026

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010308

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI