Global Patent Index - EP 1069480 A8

EP 1069480 A8 2001-05-02 - Finishing technology in image forming system

Title (en)

Finishing technology in image forming system

Title (de)

Endbearbeitungstechnik in Bilderzeugungssystem

Title (fr)

Technique de finition pour systèmes de formation d'images

Publication

EP 1069480 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 00115131 A

Priority

JP 20013199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1069480A2] The automatic document feed apparatus (DF) conveys one sheet at a time to an image reading position, reverses the sheet and returns it to the reading position, where it is read by a means (1). The image signal is processed in means (2) and sent to a forming means (3), forming an image on a recording sheet (R), while a feeding means sends recording sheets one by one to the forming means and a reversing/delivering means (6) reverses and delivers a sheet during forming of an image on both sides, before finishing apparatus (FS) stacks the sheets in order. Independent claims are included for finishing apparatus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 21/14 (2006.01); B65H 5/06 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/655 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00869 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069480 A2 20010117; EP 1069480 A3 20020130; EP 1069480 A8 20010502; EP 1069480 B1 20050209; DE 60017990 D1 20050317; DE 60017990 T2 20060112; EP 1507174 A2 20050216; EP 1507174 A3 20100120; JP 2001026338 A 20010130; JP 3921881 B2 20070530; US 6442368 B1 20020827

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170712

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170705

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-04-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60017990 P 20050317

2005-03-09 [REG GB ERR] ERRATUM

- Free text: THE ABOVE EP(UK) PATENT WAS ADVERTISED IN THE PATENTS AND DESIGNS JOURNAL NO. 6038 DATED 20050209 AS GERMAN NOTIFICATION HAS BEEN RECEIVED FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE THAT THE PUBLICATION LANGUAGE IS ACTUALLY ENGLISH.

2005-03-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2005-02-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-02-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-02-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-02-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050209

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031002

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020729

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OHTSUKA, MASARU, C/O KONICA CORPORATION,

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SAITOH, KIMIKAZU, C/O KONICA CORPORATION,

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KODERA, TETSUHIRO, C/O KONICA CORPORATION,

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KASAHARA, SEITARO, C/O KONICA CORPORATION,

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MATSUBARA, AKITOSHI, C/O KONICA CORPORATION,

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OHTSUKA, MASARU

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SAITOH, KIMIKAZU

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KODERA, TETSUHIRO

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KASAHARA, SEITARO

2001-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MATSUBARA, AKITOSHI

2001-03-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FINISHING TECHNOLOGY IN IMAGE FORMING SYSTEM

2001-01-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ENDBEARBEITUNGSTECHNIK IN BILDERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI