Global Patent Index - EP 1069485 A2

EP 1069485 A2 2001-01-17 - Alarm clock, in particular radio alarm with digital display

Title (en)

Alarm clock, in particular radio alarm with digital display

Title (de)

Weckeruhr, insbesondere digital anzeigender Funkwecker

Title (fr)

Montre réveil, en particulier réveil radio à affichage digitale

Publication

EP 1069485 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113969 A

Priority

DE 29912311 U

Abstract (en)

The alarm clock (11) includes key switches for setting an alarm time and for switching off the alarm signal, as well as a display (13) in the visible front surface area of a clock casing, for displaying the predetermined alarm time. A day switch (18) is provided for switching off the alarm signal up to the next reaching of the adjusted alarm time. The day switch is arranged on a surface of the casing of the alarm clock opposite a base- or foot surface area, and is formed as a push button to be operated against the base- or foot surface area.

Abstract (de)

Eine besonders bedienungsfreundliche und energetisch sparsam betreibbare Weckeruhr (11) mit Display (13) für digitale Weckzeitanzeige im 24-Stunden-Format ergibt sich, wenn der Tagesschalter (18), zur Abschaltung des Wecksignales bis zum nächsten Erreichen des eingestellten Weckzeitpunktes, von der sichtseitigen Vorderfront des Gehäuses der Weckeruhr (11) fort auf die der Standfläche gegenüberliegende Gehäuse-Oberfläche verlegt und dort als vergleichsweise langhubig gegen die Standfläche zu bewegender Drucktaster mit akustischer und/oder taktiler Betätigungsrückmeldung ausgelegt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04G 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04C 3/00 (2006.01); G04C 21/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04C 3/001 (2013.01); G04C 21/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29912311 U1 20001123; EP 1069485 A2 20010117; EP 1069485 A3 20061102

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-01-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070503

2007-07-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2006-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI