Global Patent Index - EP 1069516 A2

EP 1069516 A2 2001-01-17 - Pipelined methods and apparatus for weight selection and content addressable memory searches

Title (en)

Pipelined methods and apparatus for weight selection and content addressable memory searches

Title (de)

Pipelineverfahren und Gerät für Gewichtsselektion und Wiederauffindung aus inhaltsadressierbaren Speichern

Title (fr)

Procédé pipeline et dispositif pour la sélection de poids et le recouvrement dans une antémémoire

Publication

EP 1069516 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305998 A

Priority

US 35468499 A

Abstract (en)

When a search key is supplied to a content addressable memory (CAM), the CAM signals indicate which CAM entries have matched the key. These signals are provided to a weight array to select the entry of the highest priority. Each entry's priority is indicated by a weight in the weight array. The weight array processing is pipelined. In pipeline stage 0, the most significant bits (bits 0) of the weights are examined, and the highest priorities are selected based on the most significant bits. At pipeline stage 1, the next most significant bits (bits 1) are examined, and so on.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G11C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11C 15/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069516 A2 20010117; EP 1069516 A3 20060118; US 6415354 B1 20020702

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE

2006-01-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010402

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI