Global Patent Index - EP 1069541 A2

EP 1069541 A2 2001-01-17 - Mobile object monitoring system

Title (en)

Mobile object monitoring system

Title (de)

Uberwachungssystem für bewegliche Objekte

Title (fr)

Système de surveillance d'objets mobiles

Publication

EP 1069541 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305952 A

Priority

JP 20366599 A

Abstract (en)

A terminal unit (3) drives a buzzer controller (21)/LED controller (22) to give an alarm to an external when the terminal unit (3) detects the fact that an emergency information switch (23) has been depressed for a predetermined time or more. The terminal unit (3) informs a center computer (4) of an emergent state when the alarm to the external has been continued for a predetermined time. Further, the terminal unit (3) always reads a value of an acceleration sensor (17). Hence, the terminal unit (3) drives the buzzer controller (21)/LED controller (22) when recognizing the fact that the terminal unit (3) has been turned upside down for a predetermined time or more, and the terminal unit (3) informs the center computer (4) after the lapse of a predetermined time. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 25/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 21/02 (2006.01); G08B 25/01 (2006.01); G08B 25/08 (2006.01); G08B 25/10 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04M 11/04 (2006.01); H04Q 7/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/001 (2013.01); G08B 25/016 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069541 A2 20010117; EP 1069541 A3 20020320; EP 1069541 B1 20041020; DE 60015021 D1 20041125; DE 60015021 T2 20050303; JP 2001034871 A 20010209

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100714

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100713

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100713

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60015021

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100713

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090824

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090707

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090617

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-09-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60015021 P 20041125

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-10-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB SE

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI