Global Patent Index - EP 1069577 A1

EP 1069577 A1 2001-01-17 - Assembly of a ring carrier and one or several cores

Title (en)

Assembly of a ring carrier and one or several cores

Title (de)

Anordnung mit einem Ringträger und einem oder mehreren Kernen

Title (fr)

Ensemble d'un support pour anneau et d'un ou de plusieurs noyaux

Publication

EP 1069577 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00202494 A

Priority

NL 1012607 A

Abstract (en)

Assembly of a ring core carrier and one or several ring cores. The ring core carrier is provided with a top plate and a bottom plate situated at a distance thereof, and has threaded fixation rods connecting the top plate and the bottom plate to each other. Possibly a number of central rods can be placed centrally between the top and bottom plate, the number of central rods together defining an inner diameter. Furthermore a number of threaded attachment rods have been placed between the top and bottom plate. Each of the ring cores has either an inner diameter allowing fixation of the ring cores about the central rods, or an outer diameter allowing fixation of the ring cores within the threaded fixation rods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/263 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069577 A1 20010117; NL 1012607 C2 20010116

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091211

2009-06-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ASSEMBLY OF A RING CARRIER AND ONE OR SEVERAL CORES

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041213

2005-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041213

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI