Global Patent Index - EP 1069594 A2

EP 1069594 A2 2001-01-17 - DC arc Lamp

Title (en)

DC arc Lamp

Title (de)

Gleichstrombogenlampe

Title (fr)

Lamp à arc à courant continu

Publication

EP 1069594 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117488 A

Priority

  • DE 19714009 A
  • EP 98104179 A

Abstract (en)

The lamp filling consists of an ignition gas, e.g. argon, mercury and a halogen. To this is added a proportion of zinc to amplify the red component whilst reducing the color separation effect. The lamp bulb is of an asymmetrical shape relative to the plane (1) vertical to the longitudinal axis (2) in that the inner wall (3) enclosing the anode (4) is further from it than from the cathode (5),(radius of curvature ((8).smaller than (9)). This increases the temperature homogeneity

Abstract (de)

Eine neue Metallhalogenid-Gleichstrom-Bogenlampe enthält ein neues Füllungssystem insbesondere mit Cadmium und/oder Zink und weist eine verbesserte Kolbengeometrie auf. Ferner wird Schutz für eine entsprechende Projektionsvorrichtung beansprucht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/12; H01J 61/32; H01J 61/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03B 21/14 (2006.01); H01J 61/12 (2006.01); H01J 61/20 (2006.01); H01J 61/32 (2006.01); H01J 61/86 (2006.01); H01J 61/88 (2006.01); H04N 5/74 (2006.01); H05B 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/32 (2013.01); H01J 61/12 (2013.01); H01J 61/86 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0869537 A1 19981007; EP 0869537 B1 20021204; DE 19714009 A1 19981008; EP 1069594 A2 20010117; EP 1069594 A3 20010321; EP 1069594 B1 20021002; JP H10283992 A 19981023; US 6051929 A 20000418

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070309

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070309

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070309

2006-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060324

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-08 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805855 20021107

2002-10-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 869537

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01J 61/12 A, 7H 01J 61/86 B, 7H 01J 61/32 B

2001-01-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 869537

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL