Global Patent Index - EP 1069594 A3

EP 1069594 A3 2001-03-21 - DC arc Lamp

Title (en)

DC arc Lamp

Title (de)

Gleichstrombogenlampe

Title (fr)

Lamp à arc à courant continu

Publication

EP 1069594 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00117488 A

Priority

  • DE 19714009 A
  • EP 98104179 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0869537A1] A novel d.c. arc lamp has a filling which contains cadmium and/or zinc in addition to an ignition gas, mercury and a halogen. Preferably, the total concentration of Cd and/or Zn is 0.05-3.0 mu mol per ml volume of lamp vessel, the lamp power consumption being up to 170 W at 0.3-3.0 mu mol/ml concentration, 170-300 W at 0.2-2.0 mu mol/ml concentration and 300-3000 W at 0.05-1.0 mu mol/ml concentration. The filling may also contain one or more of Li, In, rare earth metal (especially Dy) and Tl. Also claimed is a projection system with a projection lamp as described above.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/12; H01J 61/32; H01J 61/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03B 21/14 (2006.01); H01J 61/12 (2006.01); H01J 61/20 (2006.01); H01J 61/32 (2006.01); H01J 61/86 (2006.01); H01J 61/88 (2006.01); H04N 5/74 (2006.01); H05B 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/32 (2013.01); H01J 61/12 (2013.01); H01J 61/86 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0869537 A1 19981007; EP 0869537 B1 20021204; DE 19714009 A1 19981008; EP 1069594 A2 20010117; EP 1069594 A3 20010321; EP 1069594 B1 20021002; JP H10283992 A 19981023; US 6051929 A 20000418

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070309

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070309

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-12-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070309

2006-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060324

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-08 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805855 20021107

2002-10-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 869537

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01J 61/12 A, 7H 01J 61/86 B, 7H 01J 61/32 B

2001-01-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 869537

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL