Global Patent Index - EP 1069596 A2

EP 1069596 A2 2001-01-17 - Discharge lamp with starting aid

Title (en)

Discharge lamp with starting aid

Title (de)

Gasentladungslampe mit Starthilfeantenne

Title (fr)

Lampe à décharge avec aide à l'allumage

Publication

EP 1069596 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00202407 A

Priority

DE 19933023 A

Abstract (en)

The external electrode, or antenna, can take the form of a metallic concentric or spiral winding (24) located outside, on the inner surface of the lamp outer envelope (14) or molded into the envelope. It is connected to the return electrode (20) of the discharge vessel (16)

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Gasentladungslampe mit einem von einem Anßenkolben umschlossenen Entladungsgefäß ist eine um das Entladungsgefäß geführte Starthilfeantenne an dem Außenkolben vorgesehen. Hierdurch können die Vorteile einer Starthilfeantenne genutzt werden, ohne eine erhöhte Natriumdiffusion in Kauf nehmen zu müssen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/30 (2006.01); H01J 61/16 (2006.01); H01J 61/34 (2006.01); H01J 61/54 (2006.01); H01J 61/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/34 (2013.01); H01J 61/16 (2013.01); H01J 61/547 (2013.01); H01J 61/82 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069596 A2 20010117; EP 1069596 A3 20010214; CN 1284737 A 20010221; DE 19933023 A1 20010118; JP 2001043831 A 20010216; KR 20010049771 A 20010615; US 6674239 B1 20040106

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030320

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI