Global Patent Index - EP 1069646 A2

EP 1069646 A2 2001-01-17 - Patch antenna

Title (en)

Patch antenna

Title (de)

Streifenleiterantenne

Title (fr)

Antenne à microbande

Publication

EP 1069646 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305729 A

Priority

GB 9916146 A

Abstract (en)

An antenna for radiating at a plurality of frequencies including a ground plane (1) serving as a reflector against which a patch (2) is electrically driven. A further patch (3) is stacked above the first patch (2) and is intended to resonate at a frequency in the upper frequency band and utilises the first patch (2) as its ground plane. The lower patch (2) is driven from voltage sources (4a, 4b, 5a and 5b) established on the ground plane (1) and connected to the patch (2) by means of probe wires (10a-d) and series capacitors (8a-d) formed within the patch. Similarly, the upper patch (3) is driven by voltage sources (6a, 6b, 7a, 7b) established in the lower frequency patch and connected by respective wire probes (11a-d) and series capacitors (9a-d) within the upper frequency patch. Respective lines joining the pairs of points are orthogonal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/04; H01Q 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/0435 (2013.01); H01Q 5/40 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0414 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069646 A2 20010117; EP 1069646 A3 20010704; GB 2352091 A 20010117; GB 2352091 B 20030917; GB 9916146 D0 19990908

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-15 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1035265

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-04-04 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20061112

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040906

2003-10-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011227

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI