Global Patent Index - EP 1069767 A2

EP 1069767 A2 2001-01-17 - Quantity-of-light adjusting apparatus

Title (en)

Quantity-of-light adjusting apparatus

Title (de)

Lichtmengenregelvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réglage de la quantité de lumière

Publication

EP 1069767 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00115144 A

Priority

JP 19953399 A

Abstract (en)

In a quantity-of-light adjusting apparatus having an iris (503) and an ND filter (502) which limit incident light, a control method for the quantity-of-light adjusting apparatus, and a computer program product providing a control program for the quantity-of-light adjusting apparatus, a state of limitation of the incident light by the iris is changed at a first changing speed, and, when a state of limitation of the incident light by the ND filter is changed, the state of limitation of the incident light by the iris is changed at a second changing speed different from the first changing speed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/238

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/238 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/238 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069767 A2 20010117; EP 1069767 A3 20020206; EP 1069767 B1 20080123; DE 60037853 D1 20080313; DE 60037853 T2 20090122; US 2005225662 A1 20051013; US 6930723 B1 20050816; US 7557857 B2 20090707

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140712

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140712

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130712

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130726

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-12-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081024

2008-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60037853 P 20080313

2008-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-01-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TSUDA, YUJI

2008-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YAMADA, KUNIHIKO

2007-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04N 5/238 A, 7G 03B 7/085 B, 7G 03B 7/095 B, 7H 04N 5/232 B, 7H 04N 5/235 B

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI