Global Patent Index - EP 1069827 A4

EP 1069827 A4 2003-06-18 - NUCLEIC ACIDS ENCODING OUTER MEMBRANE PROTEIN OF HUMAN GRANULOCYTIC EHRLICHIOSIS AGENT

Title (en)

NUCLEIC ACIDS ENCODING OUTER MEMBRANE PROTEIN OF HUMAN GRANULOCYTIC EHRLICHIOSIS AGENT

Title (de)

DIE ÄUSSEREN MEMBRANPROTEINE DES HUMANEN GRANULCYTISCHEN EHRLICHIOSE-AGENS KODIERENDEN NUKLEINSÄUREN

Title (fr)

ACIDES NUCLEIQUES CODANT UNE PROTEINE DE MEMBRANE EXTERIEURE D'AGENT D'EHRLICHIOSE GRANULOCYTAIRE HUMAINE

Publication

EP 1069827 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99916535 A

Priority

  • US 9907759 W
  • US 8119298 P
  • US 12808799 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9952370A1] The invention provides tools for serodiagnosing HGE. The tools are structurally related proteins, "Group 44 proteins", and antibodies to such proteins. The Group 44 proteins comprise a single central hypervariable region, a first conserved region and a second conserved region which flank the central hypervariable region. The Group 44 proteins comprise P44, P44-2, P44-12, P44-15, P44-18, P44-19, and variants of such proteins. The invention also provides isolated polynucleotides or nucleic acids, referred to as "Group 44 polynucleotides", which encode the Group 44 proteins and fragments thereof. Each oligopeptide comprises a sequence specific to one Group 44 protein. The present invention also provides antibodies immunospecific for and which bind to members of the P44 family of proteins. The present invention provides kits containing reagent for diagnosing HGE.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 63/00; A61K 38/00; A61K 39/02; A61K 39/40; C07H 21/04; C07K 1/00; C07K 16/00; G01N 33/53; C07K 14/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/12 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/1246 (2013.01); G01N 33/6893 (2013.01); G01N 2333/43556 (2013.01); G01N 2469/20 (2013.01); Y02A 50/57 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] WO 9849312 A2 19981105 - AQUILA BIOPHARM INC [US]
  • [PX] WO 9814584 A2 19980409 - UNIV YALE [US]
  • [X] IJDO JACOB W ET AL: "The early humoral response in human granulocytic ehrlichiosis.", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, vol. 176, no. 3, 1997, pages 687 - 692, XP002237262, ISSN: 0022-1899
  • [PX] MURPHY CHERYL I ET AL: "Major antigenic proteins of the agent of human granulocytic ehrlichiosis are encoded by members of a multigene family.", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, vol. 66, no. 8, August 1998 (1998-08-01), pages 3711 - 3718, XP002236397, ISSN: 0019-9567
  • [A] PALMER G H ET AL: "The immunoprotective Anaplasma marginale major surface protein 2 is encoded by a polymorphic multigene family", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY. WASHINGTON, US, vol. 9, no. 62, 1 September 1994 (1994-09-01), pages 3808 - 3816, XP002074855, ISSN: 0019-9567
  • [A] ASANOVICH KRISTIN M ET AL: "Antigenic diversity of granulocytic Ehrlichia isolates from humans in Wisconsin and New York and a horse in California.", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, vol. 176, no. 4, 1997, pages 1029 - 1034, XP009008696, ISSN: 0022-1899
  • [T] ZHI NING ET AL: "Multiple p44 genes encoding major outer membrane proteins are expressed in the human granulocytic ehrlichiosis agent.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 274, no. 25, 18 June 1999 (1999-06-18), pages 17828 - 17836, XP002236399, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [PX] IJDO JACOB W ET AL: "Cloning of the gene encoding the 44-kilodalton antigen of the agent of human granulocytic Ehrlichiosis and characterization of the humoral response.", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, vol. 66, no. 7, July 1998 (1998-07-01), pages 3264 - 3269, XP002236398, ISSN: 0019-9567
  • See also references of WO 9952370A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9952370 A1 19991021; AU 3483599 A 19991101; CA 2326717 A1 19991021; EP 1069827 A1 20010124; EP 1069827 A4 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040628

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-06-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01N 63/00 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/00 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/02 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/40 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07H 21/04 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 1/00 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 16/00 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/53 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/29 B

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001106

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE