Global patent index - EP 1069845 A1

EP 1069845 A1 2001-01-24 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MAKE-UP

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MAKE-UP

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFTRAGEN VON MAKE-UP

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA REALISATION D'UN MAQUILLAGE

Publication

EP 1069845 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99907672 A

Priority

  • FR 9900525 W
  • FR 9802980 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2775877A1] The applicator is composed of a foam part allowing the eye shadow to be adhered to it. A shaft is perpendicularly attached to the foam part to form a handle. When the user exerts pressure on the eyelid the eye shadow remains fixed on the eyelid. An Independent claim is included for a method of applying eye shadow using the device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 33/36 (2006.01); A45D 40/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/26 (2013.01); A45D 33/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945817A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2775877 A1 19990917; FR 2775877 B1 20000602; AU 2732499 A 19990927; EP 1069845 A1 20010124; WO 9945817 A1 19990916

INPADOC legal status

2007-10-26 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1037854

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-02-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020528

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001019

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE