Global Patent Index - EP 1069895 A2

EP 1069895 A2 2001-01-24 - COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING LYSOPHOSPHATIDIC ACIDS WHICH INHIBIT APOPTOSIS AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING LYSOPHOSPHATIDIC ACIDS WHICH INHIBIT APOPTOSIS AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSTELLUNGEN DIE LYSOPHOSPHATIDYLSÄURE ENTHALTEN WELCHE APOPTOSIS HEMMEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT DES ACIDES LYSOPHOSPHATIDIQUES QUI INHIBENT L'APOPTOSE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS

Publication

EP 1069895 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99913956 A

Priority

  • US 9905943 W
  • US 7837598 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947101A2] The invention provides anti-apoptotic compositions containing lysophosphatidic acids and methods for making and using the compositions. Such compositions can also contain LPA potentiating agents, including proteins, lipid membrane structures and polymers such as polyethylene glycols. The compositions can additionally contain other pharmaceutically effective agents such as drugs, antibiotics, wound healing agents and antioxidants.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/255; A61K 31/66; C07C 305/06; C07C 305/10; C07F 9/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/66 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947101 A2 19990923; WO 9947101 A3 19991125; AU 3191599 A 19991011; EP 1069895 A2 20010124; EP 1069895 A4 20020731

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091001

2008-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080220

2002-07-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/255 A, 7A 61K 31/655 B, 7C 07F 9/09 B, 7C 07C 305/10 B, 7C 07C 305/06 B

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001018

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE