Global patent index - EP 1069925 A1

EP 1069925 A1 2001-01-24 - MAGNETIC WRAP FOR JOINTS

Title (en)

MAGNETIC WRAP FOR JOINTS

Title (de)

MEGNETISCHER WICKEL FÜR GELENKE

Title (fr)

ARTICLES ENVELOPPANTS MAGNETIQUES POUR ARTICULATIONS

Publication

EP 1069925 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98940830 A

Priority

  • US 9816546 W
  • US 3850898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9945998A1] Flexible and elastic magnetic joint wraps (30, 28, 26, 24, 22, 20) incorporate superstrong magnets with alternating polarities to provide enhanced magnetotherapeutic effects. Magnetotherapeutic joint wraps that are flexible and elastic incorporate superstrong magnets such as those based on iron (magnetic ferrite) or neodymium (particulary neodymium-iron-boron (NdFeB)) in order to provide superstrong static magnetism by which magnetotherapy may be effected. Elements that are generally oppositely opposed serve to detachably attach portions of the magnetic wrap to one another so that the magnetic joint wrap may conform to the local shape and form of the area adjacent the joint. Additionally, eye (120) and face masks (150) may incorporate the superstrong magnets as used in the magnetic joint wrap of the present invention of good advantage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61N 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61N 2/06 (2006.01); A61N 2/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 2/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945998A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9945998 A1 19990916; AU 8901898 A 19990927; CA 2320840 A1 19990916; CN 1154523 C 20040623; CN 1290184 A 20010404; DE 1069925 T1 20010719; EP 1069925 A1 20010124; ES 2157190 T1 20010816; GR 20010300035 T1 20010731; JP 2002505928 A 20020226; MX PA00008889 A 20020424

INPADOC legal status

2008-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-03-14 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1030172

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2001-08-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2157190

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

2001-08-15 [TCAT] AT: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCAT

2001-07-19 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2001-05-11 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2001-05-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCNL

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61N 2/06 A

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000808

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000808;LT PAYMENT 20000808;LV PAYMENT 20000808;MK PAYMENT 20000808;RO PAYMENT 20000808;SI PAYMENT 20000808