Global Patent Index - EP 1069929 A1

EP 1069929 A1 2001-01-24 - IMPROVED FIRE FIGHTING NOZZLE AND METHOD INCLUDING PRESSURE REGULATION, CHEMICAL AND EDUCTION FEATURES

Title (en)

IMPROVED FIRE FIGHTING NOZZLE AND METHOD INCLUDING PRESSURE REGULATION, CHEMICAL AND EDUCTION FEATURES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND DUZE ZUR BRANDBEKÄPFUNG MIT VERBESSERTER DRUCKREGELUNG CHEMISCHEN ABFÜHRUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN

Title (fr)

BUSE D'INCENDIE PERFECTIONNEE ET PROCEDE COMPRENANT LA REGULATION DE PRESSION, DISPOSITIFS DE DECHARGE DE PRODUIT CHIMIQUE ET D'EDUCTION AMELIORES

Publication

EP 1069929 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98948538 A

Priority

  • US 9820061 W
  • US 8084698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951306A1] A fire fighting nozzle for extinguishing industrial scale fires including improved automatic pressure regulating features, enhanced educting features having central (110) and peripheral channeling (94) for foam concentrate, combined with a capacity to throw dry chemicals. The improved pressure regulating features include a spring (50) loaded double acting baffle (13), that is positioned by fire fighting fluid in communication with a hydraulic chamber, the hydraulic chamber is preferably controlled by a relief valve (42).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 5/02; A62C 5/033; A62C 31/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 31/07 (2006.01); B05B 1/26 (2006.01); B05B 1/28 (2006.01); B05B 1/32 (2006.01); B05B 7/00 (2006.01); B05B 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 31/07 (2013.01); B05B 1/26 (2013.01); B05B 1/28 (2013.01); B05B 1/323 (2013.01); B05B 7/0018 (2013.01); B05B 7/061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951306 A1 19991014; AU 745992 B2 20020411; AU 9508898 A 19991025; CA 2327476 A1 19991014; CA 2327476 C 20100817; CN 1142802 C 20040324; CN 1306448 A 20010801; DE 69841335 D1 20100107; EP 1069929 A1 20010124; EP 1069929 A4 20040506; EP 1069929 B1 20091125; ES 2337426 T3 20100423

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150925

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150925

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69841335

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140327 AND 20140402

2010-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20100826

2010-04-23 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2337426

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2010-01-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69841335

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2010-01-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB

2009-11-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2009-03-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILLIAMS FIRE AND HAZARD CONTROL, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050304

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050304

2004-05-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040318

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001025

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB