Global Patent Index - EP 1069971 A1

EP 1069971 A1 2001-01-24 - INSTALLATION FOR FORMING THE EDGES OF SPECTACLE GLASSES

Title (en)

INSTALLATION FOR FORMING THE EDGES OF SPECTACLE GLASSES

Title (de)

ANLAGE ZUM FORMBEARBEITEN DER RÄNDER VON BRILLENGLÄSERN

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION POUR FA ONNER LES BORDS DE VERRES DE LUNETTES

Publication

EP 1069971 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98961116 A

Priority

  • DE 19815728 A
  • EP 9806913 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19815728A1] An installation for forming the edges of spectacle glasses, comprising a machining device (1) for forming a left spectacle glass, a machining device (2) for forming a right spectacle glass, a conveyor device (8) for untreated and finished glass arranged in between both machining devices (1, 2) and at least one handling device (9) which can move in between the conveyor device (8) and the machining devices (1, 2) so as to remove two untreated glasses from the conveyor device (8), place each untreated glass in a machining device (1, 2), remove a finished machined spectacle glass from each machining device (1, 2) and return them to the conveyor device (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 9/14; B23Q 7/03; B23Q 7/04; B24B 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/14 (2006.01); B24B 13/00 (2006.01); B24B 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/14 (2013.01); B24B 13/00 (2013.01); B24B 41/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952673A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19815728 A1 19991014; DE 19815728 C2 20000518; EP 1069971 A1 20010124; EP 1069971 B1 20020213; WO 9952673 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091202

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-08-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803111 20020321

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-02-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-02-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001025

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT