Global patent index - EP 1070028 A1

EP 1070028 A1 2001-01-24 - HOMOGENEOUS MASSIVE POROUS CERAMIC MATERIAL

Title (en)

HOMOGENEOUS MASSIVE POROUS CERAMIC MATERIAL

Title (de)

PORÖSES HOMOGENES MASSIVES KERAMIKMATERIAL

Title (fr)

MATERIAU CERAMIQUE POREUX MASSIF HOMOGENE

Publication

EP 1070028 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99909023 A

Priority

  • FR 9900607 W
  • FR 9803490 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776287A1] A homogeneous porous bulky ceramic material, having a small mean pore diameter and a low closed porosity, is new. A novel homogeneous porous bulky ceramic material has a mean pore diameter (d50) of less than 4 mu m and a closed porosity of less than 4%. Independent claims are also included for the following: (i) a hollow fiber of the above material; (ii) a filtration and/or reaction module comprising fibers as described above; (ii) preparation of a homogeneous porous bulky ceramic material by molding and sintering of a paste of a mineral filler, an organic binder, a pore-forming agent, a solvent and optionally a deflocculant, a mineral binder and/or a processing agent; and (iii) a precursor paste for the above material, comprising a mineral filler, an organic binder and a pore-forming agent dispersed in a solvent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C04B 38/00; B01D 69/08; C04B 20/00; C04B 35/622

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 38/06 (2006.01); B01D 71/02 (2006.01); C04B 20/00 (2006.01); C04B 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 69/08 (2013.01); B01D 67/0041 (2013.01); B01D 67/0046 (2013.01); B01D 69/02 (2013.01); B01D 71/02 (2013.01); B01D 71/024 (2013.01); C04B 20/0056 (2013.01); C04B 38/0058 (2013.01); B01D 2325/02 (2013.01); B01D 2325/08 (2013.01); B01D 2325/12 (2013.01); C04B 2111/00793 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C04B 20/0056 + C04B 14/46
  2. C04B 38/0058 + C04B 35/62231 + C04B 38/0067 + C04B 38/065

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948840A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776287 A1 19990924; FR 2776287 B1 20000512; AU 2841699 A 19991018; CA 2266566 A1 19990920; CN 1229770 A 19990929; DE 1070028 T1 20030528; EP 1070028 A1 20010124; JP H11322465 A 19991124; KR 19990078084 A 19991025; NO 20004674 A 20001108; NO 20004674 D0 20000919; US 2003166449 A1 20030904; US 6573208 B1 20030603; US 7199067 B2 20070403; WO 9948840 A1 19990930; WO 9948840 A9 20000511

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20101001

2003-08-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PALL CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-05-28 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2003-02-19 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

2003-01-31 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-02-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXEKIA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001020

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE