Global Patent Index - EP 1070063 A1

EP 1070063 A1 2001-01-24 - INDOL-3-YL-CYCLOHEXYL AMINE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEPRESSION (5-HT1 RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS)

Title (en)

INDOL-3-YL-CYCLOHEXYL AMINE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEPRESSION (5-HT1 RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS)

Title (de)

INDOL-3-YL-CYCLOHEXYL AMINE DERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DEPRESSIONEN (5-HT1 REZEPTOR ANTAGONISTEN)

Title (fr)

DERIVES D'AMINE INDOL-3-YL-CYCLHEXYLE UTILISES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DEPRESSION (ANTAGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR 5-HT1)

Publication

EP 1070063 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99916450 A

Priority

  • US 9907606 W
  • US 5724498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951592A1] Compounds effective in treating disorders of the serotonin-affected neurological symptoms (5-HT1A receptor active) are provided, such compounds having formula (I), wherein: R1 and R5 are each, independently, hydrogen, halogen, lower alkoxy, lower alkyl, cyano, or trifluoromethyl; R2 and R4 are each, independently, hydrogen, lower alkyl, phenyl, or substituted phenyl; R3 is hydrogen or lower alkyl; and X and Y are each, independently, O, NR6, or CH2, wherein R6 is hydrogen, lower alkyl, phenyl, or substituted phenyl; or pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 405/12; A61K 31/40; A61K 31/535

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 413/12 (2006.01); A61K 31/404 (2006.01); A61K 31/498 (2006.01); A61K 31/538 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); C07D 405/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 405/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951592A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951592 A1 19991014; AU 3476599 A 19991025; CA 2327360 A1 19991014; CN 1304409 A 20010718; EP 1070063 A1 20010124; JP 2002510682 A 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040429

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030703

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MEWSHAW, RICHARD, ERIC

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZHOU, PING

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001002

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001002;LT PAYMENT 20001002;LV PAYMENT 20001002;RO PAYMENT 20001002;SI PAYMENT 20001002