Global patent index - EP 1070116 A1

EP 1070116 A1 2001-01-24 - BEER FLAVOR CONCENTRATE

Title (en)

BEER FLAVOR CONCENTRATE

Title (de)

AROMAKONZENTRAT FÜR BIER

Title (fr)

CONCENTRE D'AROME POUR DE LA BIERE

Publication

EP 1070116 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98958655 A

Priority

  • US 9824740 W
  • US 97622397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9927070A1] A beer flavor concentrate and a method for making and using the beer flavor concentrate to produce a final beer product through the addition of carbonated water and alcohol.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12C 11/00; C12C 5/02; C12C 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12C 5/02 (2006.01); C12C 7/20 (2006.01); C12C 11/00 (2006.01); C12C 11/11 (2006.01); C12C 12/02 (2006.01); C12G 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12C 12/02 (2013.01); C12C 5/02 (2013.01); C12C 7/205 (2013.01); C12C 11/003 (2013.01); C12C 11/11 (2013.01); C12G 3/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9927070 A1 19990603; AU 1465399 A 19990615; BR 9815618 A 20040629; CA 2310801 A1 19990603; CN 1279711 A 20010110; EP 1070116 A1 20010124; EP 1070116 A4 20040526; JP 2001524305 A 20011204

INPADOC legal status

2005-10-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050330

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-05-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040408

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 12C 11/00 A

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 12C 12/00 B

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 12C 5/02 B

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000905

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): NL