Global patent index - EP 1070122 A2

EP 1070122 A2 2001-01-24 - ADENOVIRUS FOR THE INDUCTION OF APOPTIC GENE EXPRESSION

Title (en)

ADENOVIRUS FOR THE INDUCTION OF APOPTIC GENE EXPRESSION

Title (de)

ADENOVIRUS ZUR INDUKTION APOPTISCHER GENEXPRESSION

Title (fr)

ADENOVIRUS POUR L'INDUCTION DE L'EXPRESSION DE GENES APOPTOTIQUES

Publication

EP 1070122 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99913854 A

Priority

  • US 9905359 W
  • US 7754198 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9946371A2] The present invention generally relates to viral vectors and their use as expression vectors for transforming human cells, both in vitro and in vivo. More particularly, the present invention relates to adenoviral vectors containing propapoptotic genes and their use in cancer therapy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/00; A01N 43/04; A61K 48/00; A61P 35/00; C12N 15/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/00 (2006.01); A01N 43/04 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 15/86 (2006.01); C12N 15/861 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/86 (2013.01); C07K 14/4747 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2710/10343 (2013.01); C12N 2830/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9946371 A2 19990916; WO 9946371 A3 20000824; WO 9946371 A9 20000217; AU 3183799 A 19990927; AU 762493 B2 20030626; CA 2322663 A1 19990916; EP 1070122 A2 20010124; EP 1070122 A4 20041110

INPADOC legal status

2009-04-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MCDONNELL, TIMOTHY, J.

2008-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SWISHER, STEPHEN, G.

2008-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FANG, BINGLIANG

2008-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BRUCKHEIMER, ELIZABETH, M.

2008-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SARKISS, MONA, G.

2008-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JI, LI

2008-06-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROTH, JACK, A.

2007-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: C12N 15/00 20060101AFI20070515BHEP

2007-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A01N 43/04 20060101ALI20070515BHEP

2007-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: C12N 15/86 20060101ALI20070515BHEP

2007-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: C12N 15/861 20060101ALI20070515BHEP

2007-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61K 48/00 20060101ALI20070515BHEP

2007-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61P 35/00 20060101ALI20070515BHEP

2007-06-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: ADENOVIRUS FOR THE INDUCTION OF APOPTIC GENE EXPRESSION

2006-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MCDONNELL, TIMOTHY, J.

2006-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SWISHER, STEPHEN, G.

2006-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FANG, BINGLIANG

2006-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BRUCKHEIMER, ELIZABETH, M.

2006-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SARKISS, MONA, G.

2006-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JI, LI

2006-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROTH, JACK, A.

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MCDONNELL, TIMOTHY, J.

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SWISHER, STEPHEN, G.

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FANG, BINGLIANG

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BRUCKHEIMER, ELIZABETH, M.

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SARKISS, MONA, G.

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JI, LI

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROTH, JACK, A.

2004-11-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/00 A

2004-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 01N 43/04 B

2004-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/86 B

2004-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 48/00 B

2004-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 35/00 B

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001011

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE